| Commit message (Expand) | Author | Age | Files | Lines |
* | organization.dot: Fix typos | Mateusz Piotrowski | 2024-04-18 | 1 | -2/+2 |
* | Remove $FreeBSD$: one-line sh pattern | Warner Losh | 2023-08-16 | 1 | -1/+0 |
* | Remove perforce tools and references | Minsoo Choo | 2023-07-20 | 1 | -2/+0 |
* | misc: remove swills from the portmgr graph | Rene Ladan | 2023-04-11 | 1 | -2/+2 |
* | misc/organization: add bofh as a new portmgr member | Rene Ladan | 2023-03-22 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | organization.dot: Update Core Team Secretary | Li-Wen Hsu | 2023-01-07 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | Update the organization graph for pkgmgr | Rene Ladan | 2022-10-07 | 1 | -1/+3 |
* | organization.dot: add pizzamig to portmgr | Rene Ladan | 2022-10-01 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | Update organization.dot with new CORE.12 members | Muhammad Moinur Rahman | 2022-06-10 | 1 | -2/+2 |
* | organization.dot: update the re@ roster | Glen Barber | 2022-01-04 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | organization.dot: fix a typo | Glen Barber | 2021-12-22 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | organization.dot: update the secteam roster | Glen Barber | 2021-12-22 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | organization.dot: fix ordering by last name | Glen Barber | 2021-12-22 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | organization.dot: update the re@ roster | Glen Barber | 2021-12-22 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | share/misc: update portmgr membership | Rene Ladan | 2021-11-09 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | share/misc: Update FreeBSD.org URLs | Li-Wen Hsu | 2021-07-04 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | Update with the members of the 11th core team, core.xi | Muhammad Moinur Rahman | 2020-07-01 | 1 | -3/+3 |
* | Mark Felder has stepped down from portmgr and ports-secteam | Rene Ladan | 2019-07-21 | 1 | -2/+2 |
* | Update entries for accounts@, backups@, dnsadm@, mirror-admin@, and | Glen Barber | 2019-03-11 | 1 | -6/+4 |
* | Update the re@ member list. | Glen Barber | 2019-03-11 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | Update members of doceng in the chart. | Benedict Reuschling | 2019-03-08 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | Update the core-secretary role. | Benedict Reuschling | 2019-03-06 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | Update with the members of the 10th core team, core.x. | Sean Chittenden | 2018-07-05 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | share/misc/organization.dot: updates | Kurt Jaeger | 2018-06-19 | 1 | -2/+2 |
* | Update the secteam/security officer list to match reality. | Remko Lodder | 2018-02-13 | 1 | -2/+2 |
* | Add Thomas Zander to ports-secteam | Mark Felder | 2018-02-11 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | Remove myself from ports-secteam | Jason Unovitch | 2018-01-04 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | Update several more URLs | Eitan Adler | 2017-10-29 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | Remove CVS - we don't run that infrastructure anymore | Eitan Adler | 2017-10-09 | 1 | -4/+0 |
* | Update the entry for postmaster@ | Remko Lodder | 2017-08-03 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | Update my entry in marketing. | Dru Lavigne | 2017-08-02 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | Update doceng, re, security-officer, clusteradm, webmaster and | Glen Barber | 2017-08-01 | 1 | -6/+6 |
* | Welcome back bapt@ to portmgr | Rene Ladan | 2017-06-01 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | Add amdmi3 to ports-secteam | Mark Felder | 2016-12-21 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | Add adamw, feld and rene to the portmgr organization | Rene Ladan | 2016-12-14 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | bapt stepped down from portmgr | Rene Ladan | 2016-09-17 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | Update with the members of the 9th core team. | Benedict Reuschling | 2016-08-06 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | miwi resigned from FreeBSD, update the graph | Rene Ladan | 2016-07-25 | 1 | -2/+2 |
* | erwin stepped down from portmgr, update the graph. | Rene Ladan | 2016-07-19 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | Update the Security Team member list with the actual | Remko Lodder | 2016-05-31 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | share/misc/organization.dot: list myself as the new portmgr-secretary | Rene Ladan | 2016-05-30 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | - Add myself to ports-secteam | Jason Unovitch | 2016-02-27 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | Welcome miwi back to the portmgr team | Frederic Culot | 2016-01-20 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | - Sort ports-secteam | Martin Wilke | 2015-12-29 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | - Add myself to ports-secteam | Martin Wilke | 2015-12-29 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | jhg -> jgh | Mark Felder | 2015-09-05 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | Update ports-secteam roster | Mark Felder | 2015-09-04 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | Update the portmgr members list | Frederic Culot | 2015-03-25 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | Update to reflect the current members of portmgr | Baptiste Daroussin | 2014-12-06 | 1 | -1/+1 |
* | - Update core-secretary | Gabor Pali | 2014-07-09 | 1 | -1/+1 |